EP4253577 - HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDOH, Kazuki Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KAWASAKI, Yoshiyasu Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
TOJI, Yuki Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21925785.4 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021JP41771 | Priority number, date | JP20210019667 | 10.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021019667 | [2023/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022172540 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253577 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/06, C22C38/60 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/185 (EP);
C21D1/25 (EP);
C21D1/78 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0236 (KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D8/0273 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/008 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/34 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR);
C22C38/60 (EP);
C23C2/06 (KR,US);
C23C2/28 (US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | HOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/40] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL SHEET AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/40] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER HAUTEMENT RÉSISTANTE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | Translation filed | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018131722 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims, paragraphs [0051]-[0056], [0072]-[0087] *; | [A]JP2018178248 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-8 * claims *; | [A]WO2019186989 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * claims, paragraphs [0030], [0058]-[0071] *; | [PA]WO2021079754 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-8* claims * | by applicant | JPS61157625 | JP2003138345 | JP6123966B | WO2019188642 |