Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.11.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
24.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
30.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.08.2023 | Change - representative | |
14.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.08.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |