EP4113185 - PHOTOGRAPHING OPTICAL SYSTEM AND OPTICAL PHOTOGRAPHING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARITA, Shinichi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
HOU, Xianchang Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 21927040.2 | 05.03.2021 | [2023/01] | WO2021CN79395 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022183509 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113185 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/00, G02B9/64, G02B13/04 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G02B13/0045 (EP);
G02B9/64 (EP,US);
G02B13/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/01] | G02B13/00, G02B9/64, G02B13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Title | German: | FOTOGRAFIERENDES OPTISCHES SYSTEM UND OPTISCHES FOTOGRAFIERGERÄT | [2023/01] | English: | PHOTOGRAPHING OPTICAL SYSTEM AND OPTICAL PHOTOGRAPHING APPARATUS | [2023/01] | French: | SYSTÈME OPTIQUE PHOTOGRAPHIQUE ET APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE OPTIQUE | [2023/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2022 | Translation filed | 30.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2020310083 (KIM DONGWOO [KR]) [I] 1-8 * example 1 *; | [T] - Handbook of optical systems, Aberration theory and correction of optical systems, Chapter 31: Correction of Aberrations ED - Gross H, HANDBOOK OF OPTICAL SYSTEMS, ABERRATION THEORY AND CORRECTION OF OPTICAL SYSTEMS, WILEY-VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, PAGE(S) 215 - 221, 225, (20070101), ISBN 978-3-527-40379-0, XP002719371 [T] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - Herbert Gross, "Handbook of Optical Systems, Vol.3 : Aberration Theory and Correction of optical Systems", Handbook of Optical Systems, Vol 3, Weinheim, Wiley-VCH, (20070101), pages 377 - 379, ISBN 978-3-52-740379-0, XP055169688 [T] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - Warren J. Smith, "Modern Lens Design", Modern Lens Design, McGraw-Hill, Inc, (19920101), pages 25 - 27, ISBN 978-0-07-059178-3, XP055152035 [T] 1 * the whole document * | [T] - Warren J. Smith, "Modern Optical Engineering, The Design of Optical Systems", Modern Optical Engineering, The Design of Optical Systems, McGraw-Hill, Inc., (19900101), pages 70 - 71, ISBN 978-0-07-059174-5, XP055152063 [T] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2016139372 (TANAKA TAKUYA [JP]) [A] 1-25* entire document *; | [X]CN108732727 (ZHEJIANG SUNNY OPTICS CO LTD) [X] 20-25 * description, paragraphs [0140]-[155], and figure 7 *; | [A]CN109765678 (GUANGDONG XUYE OPTOELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [A]CN110045486 (XIAMEN LEADING OPTICS CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document *; | [X]CN111566536 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-19, 25 * description paragraphs [0049]-[0088], [0098]-[0105], figure 1 *; | [A]CN111736299 (WUHU RUISHIDA OPTICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-25 * entire document * | by applicant | CN107305274 | CN107577031 | CN107957621 | CN108732716 |