EP4303357 - DIGITAL COLOR MATCHING AND DYEING METHODS, AND DIGITAL COLOR MATCHING AND DYEING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Huanyu Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101, Floor 1, Building 3 No. 8, Xingxing Road, Xingqiao Street Linping District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311199 / CN | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/02] | For all designated states Zhejiang Shanyu Group Co., Ltd WANG, Zhenyi Sanshan Village, Jiaojiang District Taizhou, Zhejiang 318000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MI, Xiongfei Taizhou, Zhejiang 318000 / CN | 02 /
LI, Ce Taizhou, Zhejiang 318000 / CN | 03 /
LI, Yiteng Taizhou, Zhejiang 318000 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Junjie Taizhou, Zhejiang 318000 / CN | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Locas, Davide, et al Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l. Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18 35122 Padova / IT | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 21928679.6 | 19.05.2021 | [2024/02] | WO2021CN94539 | Priority number, date | CN202110234342 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110234342 | [2024/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022183598 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4303357 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06P5/30, G06Q30/06 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G01J3/463 (EP);
D06P5/30 (CN);
G06Q30/0621 (CN);
H04N1/60 (EP);
Y02P90/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DIGITALEN FARBENABGLEICH UND FÄRBEN UND SYSTEME ZUM DIGITALEN FARBENABGLEICH UND FÄRBEN | [2024/02] | English: | DIGITAL COLOR MATCHING AND DYEING METHODS, AND DIGITAL COLOR MATCHING AND DYEING SYSTEMS | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES NUMÉRIQUES D'ASSORTIMENT DE COULEURS ET DE TEINTURE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2023 | Translation filed | 29.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1371073 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN1458626 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]WO2005114482 (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]CN102449644 (PPG IND OHIO INC) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN103745393 (BEHR PROCESS CORP) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN110941731 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) [A] 1-12 * description, paragraphs [0146]-[0352], and figures 1-10 * |