EP4304140 - INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Hanqing Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LI, Xincai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
TIAN, Li Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Ling Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 21928838.8 | 10.11.2021 | [2024/02] | WO2021CN129755 | Priority number, date | CN202110244780 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110244780 | [2024/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022183765 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304140 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L27/2666 (CN);
H04W72/232 (US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/02] | English: | INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS AND DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2023 | Translation filed | 28.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |