EP4307788 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yuki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KUMAGAI, Shinya Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIOKA, Shohei Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
OKAMURA, Masaya Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
OKANO, Mayuko Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 06 /
NAGATA, Satoshi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 21930244.5 | 12.03.2021 | [2024/03] | WO2021JP10254 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022190394 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307788 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04L1/08 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L1/1671 (EP);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L5/0033 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2024/03] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | Translation filed | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2019508931 (PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY CORPORATION OF AMERICA) [Y] 2, 3 [X] 1, 4-6; | [A]US2019342910 (CAO YU [CA], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0219]-[0237], fig. 11A-11B *; | [Y]US2020146044 (MAAREF AMINE [CA], et al) [Y] 2, 3 * paragraphs [0126]-[0184], [0196], [0201]-[0204], fig. 1A-4, 6B * |