Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
22.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
27.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
19.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |