Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11739209 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2023118932 | 20.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023087173 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | US11603465 | 14.03.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US202217790853 | 05.07.2022 | US202217957459 | 30.09.2022 | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022145675 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | A | JP7092273B | 28.06.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2022069419 | 20.04.2022 | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116685640 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3195318 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4310144 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023010732 | 20.09.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | WO2021JP44079 | 01.12.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022195972 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022143324 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2022 | A | JP7074227B | 24.05.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021043780 | 17.03.2021 |