EP4311091 - ANALYSIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMADZU CORPORATION 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKI, Takahisa Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAO, Kota Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 21931757.5 | 21.12.2021 | [2024/04] | WO2021JP47283 | Priority number, date | JP20210044445 | 18.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021044445 | [2024/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022196015 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4311091 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/18, G01J3/45 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G01J3/4535 (EP);
G01B9/02049 (US);
G01J3/06 (EP);
H02K33/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | ANALYSEGERÄT | [2024/04] | English: | ANALYSIS DEVICE | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2023 | Translation filed | 14.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2016142527 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0001]-[0037], fig. 1-6 *; | [A]WO2018020847 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001]-[0032], fig. 1-7 *; | [A]WO2018193499 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001]-[0048], fig. 1-15 *; | [A]JP2019158348 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001]-[0035], fig. 1, 2 * | by applicant | WO2016166872 |