EP4310862 - FACILITIES FOR WASTE LIQUID TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Hydro & Nuclear Power Co., Ltd 1655, Bulguk-ro Yangbuk-myeon Gyeongju-si 38120 Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Chorong Daejeon 34014 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hak Soo Sejong 30146 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jinsoo Daejeon 34090 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kyung Hee Daejeon 34186 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sang-Ho Sejong 30150 / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 21931827.6 | 17.11.2021 | [2024/04] | WO2021KR16915 | Priority number, date | KR20210035406 | 18.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210035406 | [2024/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022196886 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310862 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G21D1/00, G21F9/06, C02F1/32, // C02F1/42, C02F1/66, C02F101/20 | [2024/36] | CPC: |
G21D1/003 (EP);
G21F9/06 (EP,US);
C02F1/325 (EP);
G21F9/004 (US);
C02F1/42 (EP);
C02F1/66 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | G21F9/06, C02F1/32, C02F1/66, C02F1/72, B01D35/02, C02F1/42, C02F1/70, G21D1/00, G21F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABFALLFLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2024/04] | English: | FACILITIES FOR WASTE LIQUID TREATMENT | [2024/04] | French: | INSTALLATIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉCHETS LIQUIDES | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2023 | Translation filed | 15.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001091692 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2004170278 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2014092442 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]KR20180080284 (FRAMATOME GMBH [DE]); | [X]KR101999845B (KOREA HYDRO & NUCLEAR POWER CO [KR]) |