EP4188540 - SKIN TREATMENT APPARATUS USING HIGH-INTENSITY FOCUSED ULTRASOUND, CONTROL METHOD THEREOF, AND SKIN TREATMENT METHOD USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lutronic Corporation 219 Sowon-ro Deogyang-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10534 / KR | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KO, Kwangchon Paju-si Gyeonggi-do 10893 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jaewon Eunpyenong-gu Seoul 03481 / KR | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21931931.6 | 21.12.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021KR19524 | Priority number, date | KR20210137668 | 15.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210137668 | KR20210137667 | 15.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210137667 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023063494 | Date: | 20.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188540 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.04.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/02, A61B18/18, A61B8/00, A61B90/90, A61N5/06, A61N7/00, A61B18/14 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (EP);
A61N7/02 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (EP,US);
A61N1/328 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00589 (EP);
A61N2007/0034 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0091 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | A61N7/02, A61B18/18, A61B8/00, A61B90/90, A61N5/06, A61N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUTBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT HOCHINTENSIVEM FOKUSSIERTEM ULTRASCHALL, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND HAUTBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN DAMIT | [2023/23] | English: | SKIN TREATMENT APPARATUS USING HIGH-INTENSITY FOCUSED ULTRASOUND, CONTROL METHOD THEREOF, AND SKIN TREATMENT METHOD USING THE SAME | [2023/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PEAU PAR ULTRASONS FOCALISÉS DE HAUTE INTENSITÉ, SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PEAU L'UTILISANT | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 23.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011213279 (BRITVA ALEXANDER [IL], et al); | [A]KR101226659B (HIRONIC CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2018154185 (KIM YOU IN [KR]); | [A]US2020086145 (YOO SEON UK [KR], et al); | [XYI]KR20200042294 (HIRONIC CO LTD [KR]); | [XYI]KR20200105104 (ECO DM LAB CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]US7955262 (ROSENBERG AVNER [IL]); | [A]US2013046209 (SLAYTON MICHAEL H [US], et al); | [Y]US8702769 (ECKHOUSE SHIMON [IL], et al); | [YA]KR101700334B (ITC CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR101784536B | by applicant | KR101246557B | KR20210137667 | KR20210137668 |