EP4266767 - POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wenhong Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Yun Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21932051.2 | 22.03.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021CN82206 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022198419 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266767 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/04, H04W52/08, H04W52/10, H04W52/24, H04W52/36, H04W52/58, H04W52/14 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04W52/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
H04W52/242 (EP);
H04W52/58 (EP);
H04W52/10 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/43] | H04W52/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG | [2023/43] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2023 | Translation filed | 21.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2021084596 (LEE HYUNHO [KR], et al); | [E]EP3982572 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [A]US2020221399 (HOSSEINI SEYEDKIANOUSH [US], et al) [A] 1-37* entire document *; | [A] - MediaTek Inc., "Remaining issues of UL power control", 3GPP Draft; R1-1807626_Remaining issues of UL power control_RevFinal, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20180520), vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, South Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, XP051442624 [A] 1-37 * pp. 1-10 * | [A] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Power control for PUSCH enhancements", 3GPP Draft; R1-1903273 Power control for PUSCH enhancements, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20190305), vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, XP051690803 [A] 1-37 * entire document * | [A] - vivo, "Discussion on enhancement on PDCCH, PUCCH, PUSCH in MTRP scenario", 3GPP Draft; R1-2005364, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20200808), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20200817 - 20200828, XP051917389 [A] 1-37 * entire document * |