EP4319367 - TERMINAL AND RADIO BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECHIGO Haruhi Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
HARADA Hiroki Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
KURITA Daisuke Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 21933011.5 | 24.03.2021 | [2024/06] | WO2021JP12416 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022201401 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319367 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/0012 (EP);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/189 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04L25/0202 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT UND FUNKBASISSTATION | [2024/06] | English: | TERMINAL AND RADIO BASE STATION | [2024/06] | French: | TERMINAL ET STATION DE BASE RADIO | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2023 | Translation filed | 17.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX] - Lenovo, Motorola Mobility, "Enhancements for TB processing over multi-slot PUSCH", 3GPP Draft; R1-2101002, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051971337 [Y] 3 [X] 1, 2, 4-6 | [Y] - ZTE Corporation, "Discussion on joint channel estimation for PUSCH", 3GPP Draft; R1-2100097, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051970802 [Y] 3 * sections 2.1, 2.2, fig. 1, 4 * | [Y] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Discussion on multicast support for IDLE/INACTIVE UEs", 3GPP Draft; R1-2007564, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201024), vol. RAN WG1, no. E-meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, XP051946416 [Y] 3 * sections 2.1-2.3, fig. 2.3-1 * | [Y] - Samsung, "Joint channel estimation for PUSCH", 3GPP Draft; R1-2101223, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051971436 [Y] 3 * sections 2.2-2.4, fig. 2 * | by applicant | - 3GPP TS38.101-4 | - 3GPP TS38.214 |