EP4318954 - ENCODING DEVICE, DECODING DEVICE, ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 2050 W 190th Street Suite 450 Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGISETTY, Srikanth Singapore 469332 / SG | 02 /
LIM, Chong Soon Singapore 469332 / SG | 03 /
EHARA, Hiroyuki Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0057 / JP | 04 /
HARADA, Akira Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0057 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 21933230.1 | 16.11.2021 | [2024/06] | WO2021JP42063 | Priority number, date | US202163164942P | 23.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164942 P | JP20210118130 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021118130 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022201632 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318954 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/038, G10L19/107, H03M7/30, // G10L19/00 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H03M7/3082 (EP,KR);
G10L19/038 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/107 (EP);
G10L19/18 (KR);
G10L2019/0005 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | H03M7/30, G10L19/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | CODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, CODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND DECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/06] | English: | ENCODING DEVICE, DECODING DEVICE, ENCODING METHOD, AND DECODING METHOD | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE, DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2023 | Translation filed | 13.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012146831 (EKSLER VACLAV [CA]); | [A]EP2772912 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | [A]US2015025879 (LIU ZONGXIAN [SG], et al); | [E]EP4170912 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]); | International search | [A]JP2012194574 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2013118476 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JP2016535317 | by applicant | JP2021118130 |