EP4271109 - CHANNEL TRANSMISSION METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xue Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Shukun Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21934091.6 | 02.04.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021CN85345 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022205434 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271109 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W74/08, H04W72/04, H04W72/23 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W74/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/44] | H04W74/08, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | KANALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/44] | English: | CHANNEL TRANSMISSION METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE CANAL, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2023 | Translation filed | 27.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN112400356 (INTEL CORP) [A] 1-52* entire document *; | [A]WO2021031098 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-52 * entire document *; | [X] - Ericsson, "RACH based small data transmission", 3GPP Draft; R2-2103519, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210401), vol. RAN WG2, no. Electronic meeting; 20210412, XP051992125 [X] 1-52 * section 2 * | [X] - CATT, "Discussion on Physical layer aspects of small data transmission", 3GPP Draft; R1-2100317, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051970920 [X] 1-52 * section 2.1 * | [X] - ZTE, Sanechips, "Discussion on the physical layer aspects of small data transmission", 3GPP Draft; R1-2100080, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051970784 [X] 1-52 * section 2 * |