EP4317208 - AMINATION METHOD FOR POLYSTYRENE RESIN, AND METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING ENZYME USING AMINATED RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asymchem Laboratories (Tianjin) Co., Ltd No. 6 Dongting 3rd Street, TEDA Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Hao Morrisville North Carolina 27560 / US | 02 /
XIAO, Yi Tianjin 300457 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Na Tianjin 300457 / CN | 04 /
LIN, Han Tianjin 300457 / CN | 05 /
PAN, Long Tianjin 300457 / CN | 06 /
VYASA, Williams Morrisville North Carolina 27560 / US | 07 /
MA, Liteng Tianjin 300457 / CN | 08 /
CUI, Yuxia Tianjin 300457 / CN | 09 /
GAO, Yanyan Tianjin 300457 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 21934216.9 | 10.05.2021 | [2024/06] | WO2021CN92799 | Priority number, date | CN202110329787 | 29.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110329787 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022205565 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317208 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/44, C08F112/08, C12N11/082, C08F212/08, C12N9/10, C12N11/08, C08F212/36 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
C12N11/08 (EP);
C08F8/44 (EP,CN,KR);
C08F112/08 (US);
C08F212/08 (EP,KR);
C08F212/36 (EP,KR);
C08F8/32 (US);
C12N11/06 (KR);
C12N11/082 (CN,KR,US);
C12N9/1096 (EP,CN,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F8/44, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F8/44, C08F112/08 (CN,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F212/08, C08F212/36 (EP); |
Former IPC [2024/06] | C08F8/44, C08F112/08, C12N11/082 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | AMINIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR POLYSTYROLHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG EINES ENZYMS MIT AMINIERTEM HARZ | [2024/06] | English: | AMINATION METHOD FOR POLYSTYRENE RESIN, AND METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING ENZYME USING AMINATED RESIN | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMINATION D'UNE RÉSINE DE POLYSTYRÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMMOBILISATION D'UNE ENZYME À L'AIDE D'UNE RÉSINE AMINÉE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2023 | Translation filed | 29.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003024800 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [A]CN101776686 (XUZHENG SHA, et al); | [A]CN106222157 (NANJING UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY); | [A]WO2018187945 (UNIV SOUTH SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CHINA [CN]); | [PX]CN112707977 (ASYMCHEM LAB TIANJIN CO LTD) |