EP4140332 - AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT&G Corporation 71, Beotkkot-gil Daedeok-gu Daejeon 34337 / KR | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Chul Ho Daejeon 34128 / KR | 02 /
GO, Gyoung Min Daejeon 34128 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Hyung Jin Daejeon 34128 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Jang Won Daejeon 34128 / KR | 05 /
JEONG, Min Seok Daejeon 34128 / KR | 06 /
JEONG, Jong Seong Daejeon 34128 / KR | 07 /
JUNG, Jin Chul Daejeon 34128 / KR | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21935321.6 | 12.11.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021KR16505 | Priority number, date | KR20210041624 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210041624 | [2023/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211208 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140332 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/40, A24F40/10, A24F40/485, A24F7/00, A24F40/44, A24F40/50 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
A24F40/485 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (EP,KR);
A24F40/48 (US);
A24F40/05 (US);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/44 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/09] | English: | AEROSOL GENERATION DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2023/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | Translation filed | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2015245654 (MEMARI KAVEH [GB], et al); | [YA]EP3154614 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]); | [X]WO2019081571 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]); | [X]US2020397054 (RIVA REGGIORI RICCARDO [CH], et al); | [X]CN212437276U (CHINA TOBACCO HUNAN IND CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2011094523 (THORENS MICHEL [CH], et al); | [XY]KR20170007270 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [A]KR20170008209 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]); | [Y]WO2020079426 (NICOVENTURES TRADING LTD [GB]); | [Y]US2020275702 (MIRONOV OLEG [CH], et al) |