EP4117668 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ORAL TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Provectus Pharmatech, Inc. 10025 Investment Drive, Suite 250 Knoxville, Tennessee 37932 / US | For all designated states UTI Limited Partnership 3655 36 Street NW Calgary, AB T2L 1Y8 / CA | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARENDRAN, Aru Calgary, AB T2L 1Y8 / CA | 02 /
RODRIGUES, Dominic Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | 03 /
HOROWITZ, Bruce Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | 04 /
PERSHING, Edward, V. Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | 05 /
WACHTER, Eric, A. Knoxville, TN 37932 / US | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/03] | Stephens, Clare Jean, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 21935450.3 | 16.04.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021US27702 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022220841 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4117668 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/522, A61K45/06, A61P35/02 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,KR);
A61K31/522 (EP,KR);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/365 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2023/03] | A61K31/522, A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORALEN BEHANDLUNG VON LEUKÄMIE | [2023/03] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ORAL TREATMENT OF LEUKEMIA | [2023/03] | French: | COMPOSITION ET MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT ORAL DE LA LEUCÉMIE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0205812 (PHOTOGEN INC [US]); | [X]KR20070022308 ; | [A]US2019350893 (SINGER JAMIE [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2010189651 (STAGLIANO NANCY E [US], et al); | [A]US2015126483 (CAVANAGH THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]WO2018047917 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2018191363 (AURA BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [YA]US2019350893 (SINGER JAMIE [US], et al); | [A]US2020054635 (CAMPBELL JOHN EMMERSON [US], et al); |