EP4320696 - A PRESSURE BALANCING GLAND SUITABLE FOR USE IN HAZARDOUS ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bimed Teknik Aletler Sanayi ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Beylikdüzü OSB Mahallesi Bakir Ve Pirinç Sanayi Sitesi Leylak Caddesi No:16 Beylikdüzü/Istanbul / TR | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBUKREK, Yilmaz Beylikdüzü/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ORAL AVCI, Nursel Beylikdüzü/Istanbul / TR | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Mutlu, Aydin Invokat Intellectual Property Services Ltd. Kartaltepe Mh. Yildiztepe Sk. No:6-Bakirköy 34145 Istanbul / TR | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 21936187.0 | 09.04.2021 | [2024/07] | WO2021TR50341 | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022216245 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320696 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/22, H02G3/06, H02G15/00 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H02G3/0675 (EP);
H02G3/0641 (EP);
H02G3/0666 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | DRUCKAUSGLEICHSFLANSCH ZUR VERWENDUNG IN GEFÄHRLICHEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2024/07] | English: | A PRESSURE BALANCING GLAND SUITABLE FOR USE IN HAZARDOUS ENVIRONMENTS | [2024/07] | French: | PRESSE-ÉTOUPE À ÉQUILIBRAGE DE PRESSION APPROPRIÉ POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS DANGEREUX | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102011089961 (BIMED TEKNIK A S [TR]) [A] 1-6 * Abstract; Description especially paragraphs 39-49; Figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2858190 (JACOB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * Abstract; Description especially paragraphs 23, 53-54; Figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2018109093 (GIBSON ALLEN TODD [US]) [A] 1-6* Description paragraph 4 *; | [A]KR102038634B (PARK GEUN HOI [KR]) [A] 1-6 * Abstract; Description especially paragraph 23; Figures 2-3 * |