EP4274770 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OBSTACLE-FREE DRIVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORTIZ, Diego 80807 Munich / DE | 02 /
QUENTIN, Philipp 80807 Munich / DE | 03 /
HINZ, Gereon 80807 Munich / DE | 04 /
HU, Wen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiaoyu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 21938463.3 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/46] | WO2021CN91451 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022226989 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4274770 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/08, B60W30/095, G08G1/16, G06V20/58 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06V20/58 (EP);
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T7/20 (EP);
G06V10/25 (EP);
G06V20/56 (EP);
G08G1/167 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | B60W30/08, B60W30/095, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM HINDERNISFREIEN FAHREN | [2023/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OBSTACLE-FREE DRIVING | [2023/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONDUITE SANS OBSTACLE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018178800 (ISHII YASUNORI [JP], et al) | International search | [X]JP2005178623 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-12,14,15 * description, paragraphs 19-40, figures 1-5 *; | [A]JP2007102691 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN108248602 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA) [X] 1-12,14,15 * the embodiment 1 shown in figures 1-25 *; | [X]CN108284832 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC) [X] 1-12,14,15 * the embodiment 1 shown in figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102017223284 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN112489416 (ROBERT BOSCH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2018178800 | - LIU, WEI, Single shot multibox detector |