EP4325707 - POWER SOURCE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TOTEM-POLE PFC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIN, Ken Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Yuanjun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
MO, Shanglin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
KANG, Liangyun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 21938544.0 | 30.04.2021 | [2024/08] | WO2021CN91692 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022227070 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325707 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/42 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H02M1/4233 (EP);
H02M1/42 (US);
H02M1/0058 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/38 (EP);
H02M3/158 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | STROMQUELLENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER TOTEM-POL-PFC-SCHALTUNG | [2024/08] | English: | POWER SOURCE DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING TOTEM-POLE PFC CIRCUIT | [2024/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CIRCUIT PFC À PÔLE TOTEM | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2023 | Translation filed | 13.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015180330 (YE ZHONG [US]); | [A]US10630168 (WANG LINGLING [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2015091458 (LEVY YEHUDA DANIEL [IL]); | [A]CN207354049U (DONGGUAN DREAMSEMI SEMICONDUCTOR CO LTD); | [A]CN109617387 (UNIV FUZHOU) |