Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
02.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
10.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.11.2023 | Change - representative | |
14.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.11.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |