Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022231131 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | KR20220002490 | 07.01.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024306269 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | WO2021KR08960 | 13.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024215124 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | KR20220002490 | 07.01.2022 | WO2022KR03906 | 21.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4333563 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | KR20220002490 | 07.01.2022 | WO2022KR03906 | 21.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4333562 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | WO2021KR08960 | 13.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022231065 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220149409 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220149408 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20210056714 | 30.04.2021 |