EP4238465 - SHOWERHEAD EMBODIMENTS WITH PISTON OR SPRING-LOADED PISTON DELIVERY OF A LIQUID WASHING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dzhavtaev, Arslan Imaluevich ul. Tsvetnaya, 2e G. Khasavyurt Respublika Dagestan 368009 / RU | For all designated states Esuev, Khamzat Musaevich ul. Terrasnaya, 22 G. Khasavyurt Respublika Dagestan 368004 / RU | For all designated states Aidamirov, Arslan Samoilovich S. Novolakskoe Novolakskiy Respublika Dagestan 368160 / RU | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DZHAVTAEV, Arslan Imaluevich Respublika Dagestan 368009 / RU | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Yildiz, Ertan Protech Teknoloji Danismanlik Ltd. Sti. Hakimiyeti Milliye Cad. Beysel Tic. Merkezi No. 66 Kat 3 Daire:70 Uskudar 34696 Istanbul / TR | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 21940958.8 | 18.06.2021 | [2023/36] | WO2021RU00258 | Priority number, date | RU20210114338 | 20.05.2021 Original published format: RU 2021114338 | [2023/36] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022245241 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | RU | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238465 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/28, B05B1/18 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A47K3/28 (EP,RU);
E03C1/046 (EP);
B05B1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | DUSCHKOPF-AUSFÜHRUNGEN MIT KOLBEN ODER FEDERBELASTETER KOLBENAUSGABE EINES FLÜSSIGEN WASCHMITTELS | [2023/36] | English: | SHOWERHEAD EMBODIMENTS WITH PISTON OR SPRING-LOADED PISTON DELIVERY OF A LIQUID WASHING AGENT | [2023/36] | French: | POMMEAU DE DOUCHE AVEC VARIANTES À PISTON ET RESSORT-PISTON D'ENVOI D'AGENT LAVANT LIQUIDE | [2023/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2023 | Translation filed | 26.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009121042 (MITRY RAGAI [US]) [A] 1 * , par. [0045]-[0064], figures 1-15 *; | [A]US2015292186 (KAWAMOTO SHINICHI [JP])[A] 1; | [A]US2019078306 (ESTELHOMME TRACEY [US]) [A] 1; | [A]RU2698221 (GLUKHOV SERGEJ VLADIMIROVICH [RU]) [A] 1 | by applicant | RU2517998 | RU2742478 |