Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022239212 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18305 | 14.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024151438 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18305 | 14.05.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4339523 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A4 | EP4339523 | 20.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18305 | 14.05.2021 |