EP4338173 - THORIUM-BASED FUEL DESIGN FOR PRESSURIZED HEAVY WATER REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clean Core Thorium Energy LLC 404 Fox Trail Lane Oak Brook, Illinois 60523 / US | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Mehul Oak Brook, Illinois 60523 / US | 02 /
MILANY, Rida North York, Ontario M2M 4H9 / CA | 03 /
SHIRVAN, Koroush Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 21942117.9 | 26.08.2021 | [2024/12] | WO2021US47719 | Priority number, date | US202163186990P | 11.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163186990 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022240432 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338173 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/58, G21C3/60, G21C3/62, G21C3/32 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G21C3/048 (EP,KR,US);
G21C3/60 (EP,KR);
G21C3/3265 (EP,US);
G21C3/045 (US);
G21C3/328 (EP,US);
G21C3/58 (EP,US);
G21C3/62 (EP,KR);
G21C7/24 (EP,KR);
G21C1/086 (US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | THORIUM-BASIERTES BRENNSTOFFDESIGN FÜR DRUCKBEAUFSCHLAGTE SCHWERWASSERREAKTOREN | [2024/12] | English: | THORIUM-BASED FUEL DESIGN FOR PRESSURIZED HEAVY WATER REACTORS | [2024/12] | French: | CONCEPTION DE COMBUSTIBLE À BASE DE THORIUM POUR RÉACTEURS À EAU LOURDE SOUS PRESSION | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 24.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4851183 (HAMPEL VIKTOR E [US]) [Y] 30 * ; abstract; column 10, lines 15-45 *; | [YA]US2018040385 (HONG IN SEOB [CA], et al) [Y] 6-10, 14-17, 21-31 * ; abstract; figures 1-2; paragraphs [0017-0019, 0023-0029]; tables 1-2 * [A] 11-13, 18-20, 32-33; | [A]US2018075930 (BROMLEY BLAIR P [CA]) [A] 1-34* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2018151261 (YONGHEE KIM [KR], et al) [Y] 2-3, 34 * ; figure 5; paragraphs [0007-0009, 0025-0027] *; | [A]US2018254111 (BASHKIRTSEV SERGEY MIKHAILOVICH [RU], et al) [A] 1-34 * ; entire codument *; | [A]US2020321134 (O'BRIEN ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * ; entire document *; | [XYA] - Anonymous, "Accelerated Burn-up Accumulation Test of Clean Core Thorium Energy Designated ANEEL-Fuel", IDAHO NATIONAL LABORATORY, (20200909), IDAHO NATIONAL LABORATORY, (20221220), XP093009814 [X] 1,4-5 * . entire document * [Y] 2-3, 6-10, 14-17, 21-31, 34 [A] 11-13, 18-20, 32-33 | [YA] - Manish Raj, M.P.S. Fernando, Suma Nair, S.G. Ghadge, "LORA analysis using Thorium in 220 MWe PHWR fuel", Thorium Energy Conference; October 11 -18, 2015; Mumbai, India, (20151012), pages 1 - 2, XP009541664 [Y] 10, 14-17, 21-23 * entire document. * [A] 11-13, 18-20 |