EP4344459 - SERVING USER DEVICES WITH INTELLIGENT REFLECTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIAN, Mengnan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Yajun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 21944577.2 | 10.06.2021 | [2024/14] | WO2021CN99333 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022257067 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344459 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/04013 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q15/0006 (KR);
H01Q15/0086 (US);
H01Q15/147 (KR);
H04B1/0003 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Title | German: | VERSORGUNG VON BENUTZERGERÄTEN MIT INTELLIGENTEN REFLEKTIERENDEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/14] | English: | SERVING USER DEVICES WITH INTELLIGENT REFLECTING DEVICES | [2024/14] | French: | DISPOSITIFS UTILISATEURS DE DESSERTE À DISPOSITIFS RÉFLÉCHISSANTS INTELLIGENTS | [2024/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018324690 (WANG YUAN [CN], et al); | [A]CN111698010 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA); | [A]US2021051658 (PARK SEUNGIL [KR], et al); | [A]US2021126359 (KIM DONG IN [KR], et al) |