EP4350511 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CO-SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Lei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Zhenlong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Junhan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Bin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/15] | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21945512.8 | 18.06.2021 | [2024/15] | WO2021CN100865 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022261927 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4350511 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F30/20 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP);
G06F2111/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CO-SIMULATION | [2024/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CO-SIMULATION | [2024/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CO-SIMULATION | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2024 | Translation filed | 03.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009089030 (STURROCK DAVID THAYER [US], et al); |