EP4231338 - BONDING SYSTEM AND BONDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUBEI 3D SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED INNOVATION CENTER CO., LTD. 2-OS6, Xinxin Production Line Plant and Supporting Facilities 18 Gaoxin 4th Road, East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | For all designated states Hubei Yangtze Memory Laboratories 2-OS6, 18 Gaoxin 4th Road East Lake High-Tech Development Zone Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Yingchao Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Tianjian Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 03 /
CAO, Ruixia Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | 04 /
CHENG, Qu Wuhan, Hubei 430000 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/34] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 21946242.1 | 28.12.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021CN142109 | Priority number, date | CN202111595678 | 24.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111595678 | [2023/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023115615 | Date: | 29.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231338 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/68, H01L21/60, H01L21/67, // H01L23/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01L24/74 (EP,CN);
H01L21/681 (EP,CN);
H01L24/80 (EP,CN);
H01L21/67144 (EP);
H01L2224/74 (CN);
H01L2224/80 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | H01L21/68, H01L21/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/34] | English: | BONDING SYSTEM AND BONDING METHOD | [2023/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COLLAGE | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.12.2022 | Translation filed | 26.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2007134904 (WAN MING Y L [HK], et al); | [A]JP2008244255 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2013235907 (SHIBUYA KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]US2020075381 (DE BOCK ALAIN [BE], et al); | [Y]US2020219850 (GUO SHUAI [CN]); | [Y]KR102134069B ; | [Y]CN112018002 (WUHAN XINXIN SEMICONDUCTOR MFG CORP); | [A]KR20210033573 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |