EP4282507 - METHOD FOR REDUCING AGGLOMERATION OF SILVER ETCHING BY-PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Leuven Instruments Co. Ltd Liaohe West Road 8 Pizhou Economic Development Zone Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Zhiyuan Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Yuxin Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jiahe Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | 04 /
PENG, Taiyan Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | 05 /
XU, Kaidong Xuzhou, Jiangsu 221300 / CN | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 21946846.9 | 09.12.2021 | [2023/48] | WO2021CN136770 | Priority number, date | CN202110709703 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110709703 | [2023/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022267372 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282507 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01D36/00, B01D53/04, H01J37/30, H01J37/305, H01J37/32 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
H01J37/32834 (EP);
B01D46/0036 (KR);
B01D36/00 (CN);
B01D53/04 (KR);
H01J37/3002 (CN);
H01J37/3053 (CN,KR);
H01J37/32844 (EP);
H01J37/32871 (EP);
B01D2239/0407 (KR);
B01D2253/102 (KR);
B01D2253/104 (KR);
B01D2253/204 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | B01D36/00, B01D53/04, H01J37/30, H01J37/305 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG DER AGGLOMERATION VON SILBERÄTZNEBENPRODUKTEN | [2023/48] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING AGGLOMERATION OF SILVER ETCHING BY-PRODUCTS | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE L'AGGLOMÉRATION DE SOUS-PRODUITS DE GRAVURE D'ARGENT | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2023 | Translation filed | 21.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |