EP4374654 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR DATA AND SIGNALING TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo (Beijing) Limited 6 Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Mingzeng Shanghai 201315 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Jie Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
YUE, Ran Beijing 100083 / CN | 04 /
WU, Lianhai Beijing 100028 / CN | 05 /
HAN, Jing Beijing 100024 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Haiming Beijing 100011 / CN | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 21950564.1 | 23.07.2021 | [2024/22] | WO2021CN108188 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023000315 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4374654 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP);
H04W72/115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR DATEN- UND SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG | [2024/22] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR DATA AND SIGNALING TRANSMISSION | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ET DE SIGNALISATION | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |