EP4177334 - PROTEIN RECOVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD IN PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ULTRA-HIGH MALTOSE SYRUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Huakang Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 18 Huagong Road, Huabu Town, Kaihua Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Xinping Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Shengrong Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 03 /
CHENG, Yuqing Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Yuanlong Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 05 /
LIAO, Chengjun Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 06 /
LUO, Jiaxing Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Xiaobin Quzhou, Zhejiang 324302 / CN | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Sun, Yiming HUASUN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 33 80801 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21950816.5 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021CN134597 | Priority number, date | CN202110821695 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110821695 | [2023/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023000578 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177334 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/40, C12M1/02, C12M1/12, C12M1/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C07K5/0812 (EP);
C12M21/18 (EP,CN,US);
C12M47/12 (CN,US);
B01D36/02 (CN);
C07K1/145 (CN);
C07K5/06078 (EP);
C07K5/1016 (EP);
C12M23/58 (CN,US);
C12M27/02 (CN,US);
C12M33/14 (CN,US);
C12M47/10 (EP);
C12P19/12 (EP,CN);
C12P19/16 (EP,CN);
C12P19/20 (CN);
C12P19/22 (EP,CN);
C12P21/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROTEINRÜCKGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN IN EINEM HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SIRUP MIT ULTRAHOHER MALTOSEKONZENTRATION | [2023/19] | English: | PROTEIN RECOVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD IN PRODUCTION PROCESS OF ULTRA-HIGH MALTOSE SYRUP | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DES PROTÉINES DANS LE PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION DU SIROP À ULTRA-HAUTE TENEUR EN MALTOSE | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2023 | Translation filed | 03.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |