EP4368425 - THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Kexin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HU, Haomang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 21951372.8 | 30.07.2021 | [2024/20] | WO2021CN109728 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023004782 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4368425 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B60H1/00278 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/32281 (KR);
B60H1/00899 (US);
B60H1/00385 (EP,US);
B60H1/00921 (EP);
B60H1/143 (EP,KR);
B60H1/2218 (EP,KR);
B60H1/2225 (KR);
B60H1/321 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | WÄRMEVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG | [2024/20] | English: | THERMAL MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND VEHICLE | [2024/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION THERMIQUE ET VÉHICULE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2024 | Translation filed | 08.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |