EP4378260 - METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR UTILIZING DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION FOR COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Bikramjit 02880 Kirkkonummi / FI | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 21952051.7 | 28.07.2021 | [2024/23] | WO2021SE50761 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023009049 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378260 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04W72/232 (EP);
H04L1/189 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND NETZWERKKNOTEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON DOWNLINK-STEUERINFORMATIONEN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION | [2024/23] | English: | METHODS AND NETWORK NODES FOR UTILIZING DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION FOR COMMUNICATION | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU PERMETTANT D'UTILISER DES INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016119948 (DAMNJANOVIC JELENA [US], et al); | [A]US2019104503 (NIU HUANING [US], et al); | [A]WO2020032695 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2020145964 (SENGUPTA AYAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2020211951 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]US2021051636 (SENGUPTA AYAN [US], et al); | [X]US2021219329 (ZHOU MIAO [CN], et al); |