EP4397055 - POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBU, Oana-Elena 9000 Aalborg / DK | 02 /
VEJLGAARD, Benny 9260 Gistrup / DK | 03 /
HARREBEK, Johannes 9000 Aalborg / DK | 04 /
KEATING, Ryan Chicago, IL 60622 / US | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 21956217.0 | 30.08.2021 | [2024/28] | WO2021US48207 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023033784 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397055 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, G01S5/02, H04W24/10, H04B17/309 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
G01S5/0205 (EP);
G01S5/0009 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERUNG | [2024/28] | English: | POSITIONING | [2024/28] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2024 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008232297 (MIZUGAKI KENICHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2015155411 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [A]US2017123045 (SHIN PILSOON [KR], et al); | [X]US2018035256 (PREVATT TRUMAN [US]) |