Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023115480 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN140963 | 23.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230098095 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN140963 | 23.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024518229 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN140963 | 23.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3197824 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN140963 | 23.12.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4223157 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2024 | A4 | EP4223157 | 09.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021CN140963 | 23.12.2021 |