EP4223157 - ATOMIZATION CORE HAVING AIRFLOW BIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Huachengda Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Room 101, Building C1-2, Tongfuyu Dongying Industrial Park, Xinhe Avenue, Gonghe Community Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/32] | For all designated states Shenzhen Huachengda Precision Industry Co., Ltd. Floor 2, Building A1 No.2082, Jincheng Road Haoer Community Shajing Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ping Guangdong, 518000 / CN | [2023/36] |
Former [2023/32] | 01 /
chen, pING Guangdong, 518000 / CN | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 21960093.9 | 23.12.2021 | [2023/32] | WO2021CN140963 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023115480 | Date: | 29.06.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223157 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.06.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/44, A24F40/46, // A24F40/10 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A24F40/44 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (KR);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR);
A24F40/46 (EP,KR);
A24F40/485 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | A24F/ | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBUNGSKERN MIT LUFTSTROMKAMMER | [2023/32] | English: | ATOMIZATION CORE HAVING AIRFLOW BIN | [2023/32] | French: | NOYAU D'ATOMISATION AYANT UN COMPARTIMENT D'ÉCOULEMENT D'AIR | [2023/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | Translation filed | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2015201675 (LORD CHRISTOPHER [GB]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0006]; figures 2, 8 *; | [A]US2017215481 (LI YONGHAI [CN], et al) [A] 1* figures 3, 4 *; | [A]US2018289067 (COURBAT JEROME [CH], et al) [A] 1 * figure 19 *; | [XI]CN112089106 (SHENZHEN HUACHENGDA PREC INDUSTRY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0083] * * figures 4,6, 13 * [I] 5,7,9,10; | [E]WO2023102742 (SHENZHEN HUACHENGDA PREC INDUSTRY CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1,2,4,7,8 * |