EP4333063 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Haitao Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
XU, Chuanxiang Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
YU, Yong Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
WU, Huili Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
CUI, Zhao Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Wenqu Beijing 100176 / CN | 07 /
SHU, Shi Beijing 100176 / CN | 08 /
JING, Lina Beijing 100176 / CN | 09 /
MENG, Detian Beijing 100176 / CN | 10 /
NI, Zibo Beijing 100176 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 21961704.0 | 26.10.2021 | [2024/10] | WO2021CN126477 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023070328 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4333063 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.05.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/122, H10K59/124, H01L27/12, H10K59/00, H10K50/80, H10K59/80 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H10K59/124 (EP,CN,US);
H10K59/12 (CN);
H10K59/122 (EP,CN,US);
H01L27/12 (EP);
H10K59/1201 (CN,US);
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
H10K59/80521 (EP);
H10K59/873 (US);
H10K59/8792 (EP,US);
H10K71/00 (CN);
H10K71/60 (US);
H10K59/80515 (EP);
H10K59/877 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/10] | H01L27/12, H10K59/00, H10K50/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/10] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2024/10] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | Translation filed | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015380466 (KOO WONHOE [KR], et al); | [Y]US2018006273 (KIM SOOKANG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2020119113 (LEE HYEON BUM [KR], et al); | [XYI]CN111326636 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) |