EP4300917 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE AND DISPLAY DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sehwan Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Namyong Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jungbae Seoul 08592 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Gyujin Seoul 08592 / KR | 05 /
PARK, Jingu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 21966496.8 | 03.12.2021 | [2024/01] | WO2021KR18251 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023101070 | Date: | 08.06.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300917 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/40, H04L12/40, H04L49/00, G06F3/14, G06F9/455 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H04L12/44 (EP);
B60R16/023 (US);
G06F3/1431 (EP,US);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G09G5/001 (EP);
H04L65/80 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
G06F2009/45583 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45595 (EP);
G09G2360/18 (EP);
G09G2370/022 (EP);
G09G2380/10 (EP);
H04L12/40 (EP);
H04L2012/40215 (EP);
H04L2012/40273 (EP);
H04L2012/445 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2024/01] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE FOR VEHICLE AND DISPLAY DEVICE FOR VEHICLE, HAVING SAME | [2024/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION POUR VÉHICULE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR VÉHICULE ÉQUIPÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2023 | Translation filed | 30.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR100561636B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-20* See claim 1; and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2013102393 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0041]; and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]JP6523298B (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECHNOLOGY COMPANY) [Y] 10-18,20 * See paragraphs [0026], [0029], [0036], [0063]-[0065], [0069] and [0077]; and figures 2 and 4-5. *; | [Y]KR20200125133 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0015], [0017], [0021], [0034] and [0041]; and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR102244569B (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0041]-[0043], [0045] and [0069]; and figures 1 and 9. * |