Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4448254 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180104718 EP21968326 US2021063105W US202118719204



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2023113770Global Dossier 22.06.2023A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US63105 13.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025053152Global Dossier 13.02.2025A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US63105 13.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN118354892Global Dossier 16.07.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2021US63105 13.12.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4448254Global Dossier 23.10.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2021US63105 13.12.2021