EP4109473 - METHOD TO DETECT AND LOCATE THE IN-CORE POSITION OF FUEL BUNDLES WITH CLADDING PERFORATIONS IN CANDU-STYLE NUCLEAR REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/52] | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Company LLC 1000 Westinghouse Drive Suite 141 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heibel, Michael D. Harrison City, PA 15636 / US | 02 /
Arndt, Jeffrey L. Pittsburgh, PA 125203 / US | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Steinerstraße 15/A 81369 München / DE | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/52] | Gallo, Wolfgang Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 22000179.6 | 10.06.2020 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | US201916439061 | 12.06.2019 Original published format: US201916439061 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109473 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4109473 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/04, G21C17/10, G01T1/24, H01L31/0232, H01L31/10, H01L31/115 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G21C17/044 (EP,KR,US);
G21C17/041 (KR,US);
G01T1/24 (EP,KR,US);
G21C17/047 (KR,US);
G21C17/048 (KR,US);
G21C17/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/0232 (EP,KR);
H01L31/10 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/115 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN UND LOKALISIEREN DER LAGE IM KERN VON BRENNSTOFFBÜNDELN MIT MANTELPERFORATIONEN IN CANDU-KERNREAKTOREN | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD TO DETECT AND LOCATE THE IN-CORE POSITION OF FUEL BUNDLES WITH CLADDING PERFORATIONS IN CANDU-STYLE NUCLEAR REACTORS | [2022/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER ET DE LOCALISER LA POSITION DANS LE COEUR DE GRAPPES DE COMBUSTIBLEAYANT DES PERFORATIONS DE REVÊTEMENT DANS LES RÉACTEURS NUCLÉAIRES CANDU | [2023/25] |
Former [2022/52] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER ET DE LOCALISER LA POSITION DANS LE C UR DE GRAPPES DE COMBUSTIBLEAYANT DES PERFORATIONS DE REVÊTEMENT DANS LES RÉACTEURS NUCLÉAIRES CANDU | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 29.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20750830.0 / EP3984047 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0214904 (SMT HB [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 7 ** page 6, line 18 - page 9, line 20 *; | [AD]US2013285068 (HEIBEL MICHAEL D [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] - [0017] *; | [AD] - R D Macdonald ET AL, "DETECTING, LOCATING AND IDENTIFYING FAILED FUEL IN CANADIAN POWER REACTORS", (19900201), URL: https://inis.iaea.org/collection/NCLCollectionStore/_Public/22/060/22060599.pdf?r=1, (20200914), XP055730185 [AD] 1-7 * abstract * * sections B-D, pages 4-26 * | [AD] - NAGESWARA S V RAO ET AL, "Identification of Low-Level Point Radiation Sources Using a Sensor Network", 2008 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION PROCESSING IN SENSOR NETWORKS, (20080422), doi:10.1109/IPSN.2008.19, ISBN 978-0-7695-3157-1, pages 493 - 504, XP058248610 [AD] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IPSN.2008.19 | by applicant | US9831375 | - L. KATZA.S. PENFOLD, Rev. Mod. Phys., (19520000), vol. 24, page 28 |