EP4328177 - AVOIDING NITRATION DURING OPERATION OF AN AMMONIA CRACKING FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behrens, Axel 82049 Pullach / DE | 02 /
Heinzel, Albrecht 82049 Pullach / DE | 03 /
Reinke, Michael 82049 Pullach / DE | 04 /
Peschel, Andreas 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Werner Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22020406.9 | 22.08.2022 | [2024/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328177 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/04, B01D53/047, C01B3/56 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C01B3/047 (EP);
C01B3/56 (EP);
C01B2203/0277 (EP);
C01B2203/043 (EP);
C01B2203/085 (EP);
C01B2203/141 (EP);
C01B2203/142 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMEIDUNG VON NITRIERUNGEN BEIM BETRIEB EINES AMMONIAKSPALTOFENS | [2024/09] | English: | AVOIDING NITRATION DURING OPERATION OF AN AMMONIA CRACKING FURNACE | [2024/09] | French: | PRÉVENTION DE NITRURATIONS LORS DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN FOUR DE CRAQUAGE D'AMMONIAC | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19652125 (LEVERKUS VOLKER DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 8,9 * column 4, lines 48-59; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-7,10-12; | [XAI]JP2019189467 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND ENG CO LTD) [X] 8-10,12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0030] - [0035] - [0041] - [0043] - [0049] , [0050] , [0058]; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,7,11 [I] 1-5; | [XA]CN113896168 (SOUTHWEST RES & DESIGN INST CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-5,8-10,12 * example 1 * [A] 6,7,11; | [A]EP3995444 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0016]; claim 1 *; | [E]WO2022189560 (TOPSOE AS [DK]) [E] 8-10 * figure 1 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 13 * * page 8, lines 2-22 * * page 25, line 27 - page 27, line 18 * |