EP4300393 - METHOD FOR LOSS DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koch, Michael 82049 Pullach / DE | 02 /
Slaby, Oliver 82049 Pullach / DE | 03 /
Kireev, Vitalij 82049 Pullach / DE | 04 /
Nowagk, Michael 82049 Pullach / DE | 05 /
Kühn, Alexander 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22020623.9 | 22.12.2022 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300393 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q10/10, G06Q50/06, F17C13/02, G01F17/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP);
F17C7/00 (EP);
F17C9/00 (EP);
G01F13/006 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q10/0832 (EP);
F17C2221/011 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2221/014 (EP);
F17C2221/016 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2223/046 (EP);
F17C2225/0153 (EP);
F17C2225/0161 (EP);
F17C2227/0135 (EP);
F17C2250/032 (EP);
F17C2250/0443 (EP);
F17C2250/0447 (EP);
F17C2265/061 (EP);
F17C2265/063 (EP);
F17C2270/0171 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERLUSTDETEKTION | [2024/01] | English: | METHOD FOR LOSS DETECTION | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PERTE | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004117135 (ROGERS WARREN F [US], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0121] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-12; | [I]US2022307652 (EWAN JAMES M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0089] ** figures 1a, 1b, 3d *; | [I] - BAHADORI A ET AL, "Estimation of displacement losses from storage containers using a simple method", JOURNAL OF LOSS PREVENTION IN THE PROCESS INDUSTRIES, ELSEVIER, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JLP.2009.10.003, ISSN 0950-4230, (20100301), pages 367 - 372, (20091028), XP026893047 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jlp.2009.10.003 |