EP4027249 - CONNECTION MANAGEMENT IN A NETWORK ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidma St 26 Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | [2024/39] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states Mellanox Technologies, Ltd. Hakidama 26, Ofer Industrial Park 2069200 Yokneam / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YEFET, Gal 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
MARCOVITCH, Daniel 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
MOYAL, Roee 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 04 /
SHAHAR, Ariel 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 05 /
BLOCH, Gil 2069200 Yokneam / IL | 06 /
NARKIS, Lior 2069200 Yokneam / IL | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 22150387.3 | 05.01.2022 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | US202117142366 | 06.01.2021 Original published format: US202117142366 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027249 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP);
H04L69/161 (CN);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L41/0627 (US);
H04L41/0654 (EP);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04L49/253 (EP,US);
H04L49/9005 (EP,US);
H04L69/325 (CN);
H04L69/326 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVERWALTUNG IN EINEM NETZWERKADAPTER | [2022/28] | English: | CONNECTION MANAGEMENT IN A NETWORK ADAPTER | [2022/28] | French: | GESTION DE CONNEXION DANS UN ADAPTATEUR DE RÉSEAU | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 03.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014310369 (MAKHERVAKS VADIM [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 3A *; | [A]US2017346742 (SHAHAR ARIEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 2 *; | [I]US2020259759 (SHALEV LEAH [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0127] - [0129]; figure 7A * | by applicant | US8213315 | US8761189 |