EP4026602 - FLUE GAS TREATMENT METHOD AND INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIÉTÉ ANONYME POUR L'ÉTUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCÉDÉS GEORGES CLAUDE 75 Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEL CORSO, Fabrice 78350 Les Loges-en-Josas / FR | 02 /
CAUDAL, Jean 78350 Les Loges-en-Josas / FR | 03 /
PAUBEL, Xavier 78350 Les Loges-en-Josas / FR | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 22150712.2 | 10.01.2022 | [2022/28] | Priority number, date | EP20210151089 | 12.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21151089 | EP20210154239 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21154239 | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026602 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D51/10, B01D53/26, B01D53/14 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
B01D51/10 (EP,US);
F23J15/02 (CN);
B01D53/60 (US);
B01D53/02 (US);
B01D53/1431 (EP);
B01D53/145 (EP);
B01D53/265 (EP);
C01B32/50 (CN,US);
B01D2256/22 (EP);
B01D2258/0233 (EP);
B01D2258/025 (EP);
B01D2258/0283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHGASBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -ANLAGE | [2022/28] | English: | FLUE GAS TREATMENT METHOD AND INSTALLATION | [2022/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ DE CARNEAU | [2022/28] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5057133 (CHEN MICHAEL S [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9-11,14,15 * figure 1; claim 1 * * column 6, lines 11-22,27-33,60-65 * * column 7, lines 23-33 * [I] 6,8,12,13; | [A]WO2010036668 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 * * paragraph [0051] *; | [A]US2014020398 (MITTRICKER FRANKLIN F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0049] , [0051] *; | [X]US2019022573 (WESTON SIMON C [US]) [X] 11,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]EP3670705 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-15* figure 2 * | by applicant | US5743929 | US5925326 |