EP4017117 - METHOD FOR PERFORMING RELAY FORWARDING ON INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL LINKS, INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD, NODE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Ying Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Lin Shenzhen, 518057 / CN | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 22150967.2 | 04.04.2019 | [2022/25] | Priority number, date | CN201810302723 | 05.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810302723 | [2022/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017117 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W40/22, H04W76/00, H04W40/02, // H04W92/20, H04W88/08, H04W84/04 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04W40/02 (EP);
H04W8/08 (CN,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/11 (EP);
H04W76/12 (EP);
H04W84/047 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RELAISWEITERLEITUNG AUF INTEGRIERTEN ZUGANGS- UND BACKHAULVERBINDUNGEN, INFORMATIONSERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN, KNOTEN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/25] | English: | METHOD FOR PERFORMING RELAY FORWARDING ON INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL LINKS, INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD, NODE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR EFFECTUER UN RÉACHEMINEMENT DE RELAIS SUR DES LIAISONS INTÉGRÉES D'ACCÈS ET DE RACCORDEMENT, PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS, NOEUD ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19780942.9 / EP3780877 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011023101 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0081] , [0 99] - paragraph [0101]; figure 13 * * paragraphs [0098] , [0099] *; | [XI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Architecture and Protocols: MAC adaptation layer based IAB", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180993 MAC ADAPT BASED IAB PROTOCOL ARCHITECTURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180217), XP051401627 [X] 1-14 * figure 1 * * figures 5,6 * * page 1, paragraph last * * page 2 - page 3; figure 2 * * chapter 2.4; page 4; figures 1,2 * * Observations 5, 6, 11; page last * * chapter 2; page 1 * * chapter 2.6; page 5 * [I] 2-13 | [XA] - INTEL CORPORATION, "On RAN architecture for IAB relaying in NR", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180216), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-181351_IAB_ARCHITECTURE_V3_1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180216), XP051401582 [X] 1,14 * page 4; figures 1, 5, 6 * * Alternative 3; page 4 * * page 4 - page 5; figures 6-9 * [A] 2-13 | [A] - HUAWEI, "Overview on Support of IAB", vol. RAN WG3, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180214), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-180815 CONSIDERATIONS ON SUPPORT OF IAB, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG3%5FIu/TSGR3%5F99/Docs/, (20180214), XP051401228 [A] 1-14 * chapter 2.4. * |