EP4033656 - METHOD FOR DRIVING AN AT LEAST TWO-PHASE BRUSHLESS MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sammoud, Hafedh 8090 Kelibia / TN | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 22151079.5 | 12.01.2022 | [2022/30] | Priority number, date | BE20210005056 | 26.01.2021 Original published format: BE 202105056 | [2022/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033656 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/182, H02P6/21, H02P6/34 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H02P6/182 (EP);
H02P6/21 (EP);
H02P6/34 (EP);
H02P2203/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES MINDESTENS ZWEIPHASIGEN BÜRSTENLOSEN MOTORS | [2022/30] | English: | METHOD FOR DRIVING AN AT LEAST TWO-PHASE BRUSHLESS MOTOR | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN MOTEUR SANS BALAI AU MOINS BIPHASÉ | [2022/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/30] | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19806258 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [Y] 2,9,10 * column 2, line 18 - line 34 ** column 1, line 3 - line 10 *; | [XYI]EP1014555 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017]; figure 2 * [Y] 2,9,10 [I] 8 |