EP4213187 - ELECTRONIC PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexperia B.V. Jonkerbosplein 52 6534 AB Nijmegen / NL | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tang, Qingyuan Dongguan, 523750 / CN | 02 /
Zhao, YuJun Dongguan, 523750 / CN | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Pjanovic, Ilija Nexperia B.V. Legal & IP Jonkerbosplein 52 6534 AB Nijmegen / NL | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 22151143.9 | 12.01.2022 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4213187 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56, H01L21/683, H01L23/00, H01L23/31, // H01L23/544, H01L23/64, H01L23/538 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (CN);
H01L24/95 (US);
H01L21/568 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP);
H01L23/3107 (EP,CN,US);
H01L23/48 (CN);
H01L23/544 (EP);
H01L24/13 (US);
H01L24/19 (EP);
H01L24/20 (EP);
H01L24/29 (US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/96 (EP);
H01L2221/68359 (EP);
H01L2223/5446 (EP);
H01L2223/54486 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP);
H01L2224/0603 (EP);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/13 (US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP);
H01L2224/2518 (EP);
H01L2224/29111 (US);
H01L2224/29124 (US);
H01L2224/29139 (US);
H01L2224/29144 (US);
H01L2224/29147 (US);
H01L2224/73153 (US);
H01L2224/73259 (EP);
H01L2224/81005 (EP);
H01L2224/82039 (EP);
H01L2224/92224 (EP);
H01L2224/95001 (US);
H01L2224/96 (US);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H01L23/642 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP);
H01L24/92 (EP);
H01L24/97 (EP);
H01L2924/1305 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES PAKET UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/29] | English: | ELECTRONIC PACKAGE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2023/29] | French: | BOÎTIER ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 22.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2012086129 (TIMME HANS-JOERG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,8-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0060]; figures 3A-4 * [A] 6 [Y] 7; | [A]US2019326255 (OLSON TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [A] 6* paragraph [0045]; figures 2A-2F *; | [Y]US2020176412 (KESSLER ANGELA [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0117] , [0129]; figures 6-10 * |