EP4030377 - RESPONDER OVERSIGHT SYSTEM FOR AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tusimple, Inc. 9191 Towne Centre Drive Suite 600 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAM, Joyce San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22151480.5 | 14.01.2022 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | US202117150581 | 15.01.2021 Original published format: US202117150581 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030377 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/30, B60W60/00, H04W4/90 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP);
B60W60/007 (CN,US);
B60W60/001 (CN);
G05D1/0011 (CN);
G05D1/0022 (CN);
G05D1/0061 (US);
G05D1/0214 (US);
G05D1/0276 (US);
G05D1/247 (US);
G05D1/617 (US);
G05D1/81 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q50/265 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP);
G07C5/008 (US);
G07C5/0841 (US);
G08G1/017 (EP);
G08G1/205 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP);
H04W4/40 (EP);
H04W4/90 (EP);
B60W2510/0676 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTWORTSENDERÜBERBLICKSYSTEM FÜR EIN AUTONOMES FAHRZEUG | [2022/29] | English: | RESPONDER OVERSIGHT SYSTEM FOR AN AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2022/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE RÉPONDEUR POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 19.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019171202 (FAIRFIELD NATHANIEL [US], et al); |