EP4212838 - SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A SWITCHGEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GITZEL, Ralf 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KOZEL, Tomas 635 00 Brno / CZ | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 22151523.2 | 14.01.2022 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4212838 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, G01J5/48, G06T7/00, H02B13/065, G06T7/11, G06T7/136 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G01J5/0096 (EP);
G01R31/327 (CN);
G01J5/0066 (EP,US);
G01J5/48 (CN);
G01J5/485 (EP);
G06T7/0004 (EP);
G06T7/0008 (US);
G06V10/82 (US);
G09G5/377 (US);
H04N23/20 (US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30164 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINER SCHALTANLAGE | [2023/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MONITORING A SWITCHGEAR | [2023/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN APPAREILLAGE DE COMMUTATION | [2023/29] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3716205 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]CN112305382 (KUNMING POWER SUPPLY BUREAU YUNNAN POWER GRID CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3786598 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3859674 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - GITZEL RALF ET AL, "AUTOMATIC ANALYSIS OF THERMOGRAMS - CHALLENGE IN THERMAL MONITORING OF SWITCHGEARS USING INFRARED CAMERAS", CIRED 2021, THE 26TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION ON ELECTRICITY DISTRIBUTION, doi:10.1049/icp.2021.1581, ISBN 978-1-83953-591-8, (20210920), pages 395 - 399, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stampPDF/getPDF.jsp?tp=&arnumber=9692744&ref=aHR0cHM6Ly9pZWVleHBsb3JlLmllZWUub3JnL2RvY3VtZW50Lzk2OTI3NDQ=, XP055931303 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/icp.2021.1581 | [A] - YAN YUNFENG ET AL, "A Real-Time IR-Fusion Switchgear Contact Monitoring System (SCMS)", IEEE ACCESS, (20170525), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2698060, pages 12114 - 12124, XP011657088 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2017.2698060 |